skip to content

Morgan, Roger Edward

CPSO#: 16085

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 May 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 6-Mar-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1957
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 25 May 1994

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 May 1993
Summary:

 In February 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Morgan guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Morgan's licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 09 May 1994
Hearing Date(s): 09 Jul 1992