skip to content

Morgan, Moheb

CPSO#: 87542

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ReGen Medical Clinic - Etobicoke
5359 Dundas St. W
Suite 103
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Phone: (888) 575-8181
Fax: (855) 779-7978 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dunbloor Medical Clinic
5117 Dundas St. W
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1C1
Canada
Phone: (416) 482-1980
Fax: (647) 559-1248
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

ReGen Medical Clinic - Aurora
14987 Yonge St.
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Canada
Phone: (888) 575-8181
Fax: (855) 779-7978
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

ReGen Medical Clinic - Mimico
2438 Lake Shore Blvd. W.
Toronto ON  M8V 1C4
Canada
Phone: (888) 575-8181
Fax: (855) 779-7978
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St.
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-2581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 369-1801
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Moheb Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Morgan ( CPSO# 87542 )

Business Address:
ReGen Medical Clinic
103 - 5359 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 233-4444

Business Address:
5117 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1C1
Phone Number: (888) 575-8181

Business Address:
14987 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone Number: (888) 575-8181

Business Address:
2438 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 1C4
Phone Number: (888) 575-8181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHEB MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008