skip to content

Morgan, Kathryn Rachel

CPSO#: 90694

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Healthlink
Unit 10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Fax: (519) 740-6010 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN RACHEL MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011