skip to content

Morgan, Erin Robyn

CPSO#: 97156

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nova Scotia Cancer Centre
Bethune Building, Room 457C
1276 South Park Street
Halifax NS  B3H 2Y9
Phone: 902-473-3748

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Erin Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN ROBYN MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
EL - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 21 Sep 2012
EL - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017