skip to content

Morgan, Danielle Lindsay

CPSO#: 94560

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Farrow, Danielle Lindsay (used until: 28 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
123 3rd Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morgan ( CPSO# 94560 )

Business Address:
6016 Silver Maple Rd
LaSalle ON  N9H L6
Phone Number: 519-966-4853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELLE LINDSAY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Sep 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014