skip to content

Morgan, Andrew William

CPSO#: 86203

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
700 Gordon St
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: 905-668-5881 Ext. 6960
Fax: 905-444-4439 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock St. S.
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Canada
Phone: 905-666-0831
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew W. Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morgan ( CPSO# 86203 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores
Forensic Psychiatry Division
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Business Address:
Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Phone Number: (905) 666-0831

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
CMHA - Durhman 60 Bond Street West
Oshawa ON  L1G 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 436-8760

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLIAM MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012