skip to content

Moretti, Felipe Mangoni

CPSO#: 87112

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2011
EXPIRY DATE
30 Apr 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fundacao Universidade De Caxias Do Sul, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa General Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Room 8482
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75506
Fax: (613) 737-8070 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Felipe Moretti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Moretti ( CPSO# 87112 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa General Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room 8482
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:07 Mar 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Felipe Mangoni Moretti may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics  and  Gynecology,  Division  of Maternal Fetal Medicine,
                        University  of  Ottawa,  in  which Dr. Moretti  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Moretti no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued on March  7,  2019,  and  expires on April 30,
                  2023.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Moretti's  academic  appointment  at  the
                  University  of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended,  subject  to  the
                  limitations in paragraph 2 above.