skip to content

Moreno Garijo, Jacobo

CPSO#: 89623

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Valencia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and
Pain Management
200 Elizabeth Street, EN3-460
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3227 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moreno Garijo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moreno Garijo ( CPSO# 89623 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Management
200 Elizabeth Street
EN3-460
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3227

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:08 Jan 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021 Active
 Dr. JACOBO MORENO GARIJO may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.