skip to content

Moreno, Agustin Alexander

CPSO#: 89368

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone: (289) 396-2794
Fax: (289) 396-1847 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Tong & A. Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tong ( CPSO# 89317 )
Dr. A. Moreno ( CPSO# 89368 )

Business Address:
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone Number: (289) 396-2794

Business Address:
2-2956 Highway 69 North
Val Caron ON  P3N 1E3
Phone Number: (888) 637-5485

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 24 Jun 2021 Active
 As from June 24, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Augustin Alexander Moreno in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Moreno to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. AGUSTIN ALEXANDER MORENO
("Dr. Moreno") to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)		In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, I 99 I, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College; 

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Moreno, certificate of registration number 89368, am a member of the College.

(3)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that following a report that raised concerns about my standard of practice in Emergency Medicine, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College in File Number 319539 raised concerns about my standard of practice in telemedicine.

(4)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that I no longer practice Emergency Medicine, urgent care or telemedicine, with the exception that I may provide care to patients of my current family medicine practice by telemedicine.

(5)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that I entered into an Undertaking with the College dated June 5, 2019.  This Undertaking replaces and supercedes my June 5, 2019 Undertaking.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(6)	I, Dr. Moreno, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(7)	Change of Scope/Re-Entering Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Moreno, undertake that, prior to resuming practice in Emergency Medicine, urgent care or telemedicine (the latter to patients other than those of my current family medicine practice), l will notify the College and comply with the process set out in the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice attached hereto as Appendix "A".

(8)	Monitoring

(a)	I, Dr. Moreno, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which l am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Moreno, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Moreno, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff' or "Chiefs of Staff').

(13)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a report that raised concerns about his standard of practice in Emergency Medicine, Dr. Moreno underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Moreno's standard of practice in telemedicine.

Dr. Moreno no longer practices Emergency Medicine, urgent care or telemedicine (with the exception of providing care to patients of his current family medicine practice by telemedicine). Prior to resuming practice in these areas,
 
Dr. Moreno shall notify the College and comply with the process set out in the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.

D.	CONSENT

(16)	I. Dr. Moreno, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.







Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Augustin Alexander Moreno to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 24, 2021:

Following a report that raised concerns about his standard of practice in Emergency Medicine, Dr. Moreno underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Moreno's standard of practice in telemedicine.

Dr. Moreno no longer practices Emergency Medicine, urgent care or telemedicine (with the exception of providing care to patients of his current family medicine practice by telemedicine). Prior to resuming practice in these areas, Dr. Moreno shall notify the College and comply with the process set out in the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.