skip to content

Moreno, Agustin Alexander

CPSO#: 89368

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone: (289) 396-2794
Fax: (289) 396-1847 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Tong & A. Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tong ( CPSO# 89317 )
Dr. A. Moreno ( CPSO# 89368 )

Business Address:
574 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Y6
Phone Number: (289) 396-2794

Business Address:
2-2956 Highway 69 North
Val Caron ON  P3N 1E3
Phone Number: (888) 637-5485

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 05 Jun 2019 Active
             As of January 8, 2020, Dr. Agustin Alexander Moreno completed the following
            professional education required in his Undertaking dated June 5, 2019:

                  1)    Medical Record Keeping Course

            As from June 5, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Agustin Alexander
            Moreno, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Moreno to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                  DR. AGUSTIN ALEXANDER MORENO
                                          ("Dr. Moreno")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                           (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Moreno, certificate of registration number 89368, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that following a report that raised concerns
                  about my standard of practice in Emergency Medicine, I underwent
                  remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice.  The
                  reassessment report subsequently received by the College in File Number
                  319539 raised concerns about my standard of practice in telemedicine.

            (4)   I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that I no longer practice Emergency Medicine,
                  urgent care or telemedicine. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Moreno, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Moreno, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in medical
                              record keeping.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Moreno, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Moreno, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of the Effective Date or, if no satisfactory program is
                        available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Change of Scope/Re-Entering Practice 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Moreno, undertake that, prior to resuming practice in
                        Emergency Medicine, urgent care or telemedicine, I will notify the
                        College and comply with the process set out in the College's Policy
                        on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or
                        Re-Entering Practice attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Moreno, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Moreno, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Moreno, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Moreno, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Following a report that raised concerns about his standard of
                        practice in Emergency Medicine, Dr. Moreno underwent remediation
                        and submitted to a reassessment of his practice.  The reassessment
                        report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about
                        Dr. Moreno's standard of practice in telemedicine.  
                  
                        Dr. Moreno no longer practices Emergency Medicine, urgent care or
                        telemedicine.  Prior to resuming practice in these areas, Dr.
                        Moreno shall notify the College and comply with the process set out
                        in the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of
                        Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.
                  
                        As a result of the reassessment, Dr. Moreno will also engage in
                        professional education in medical record-keeping.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Moreno, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Moreno, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Moreno, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 5, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of January 8, 2020, Dr. Agustin Alexander Moreno completed the following professional education required in his Undertaking dated June 5, 2019:

1) Medical Record Keeping Course

Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Agustin Alexander Moreno to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 5, 2019:

Following a report that raised concerns about his standard of practice in Emergency Medicine, Dr. Moreno underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Moreno’s standard of practice in telemedicine.

Dr. Moreno no longer practices Emergency Medicine, urgent care or telemedicine. Prior to resuming practice in these areas, Dr. Moreno shall notify the College and comply with the process set out in the College’s Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.

As a result of the reassessment, Dr. Moreno will also engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.