skip to content

Moreau, Kristina Danielle

CPSO#: 84606

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa, ON
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3691 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Office of the Chief Coroner
22 Morton Schulman Rd
Toronto ON  M3M 2G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 925-0201
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

230 Westney Rd S
Ontario Power Generation
Ajax ON  L1S 7R3
Canada
Phone: (905) 925-0201
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Apr 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTINA DANIELLE MOREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2009
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.