skip to content

More, Kiran Sopan

CPSO#: 99806

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Mumbai, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 10 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014