skip to content

Morant, Kareem

CPSO#: 93668

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiac Care North York
5 Fairview Mall Drive Unit 260
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 907-4990
Fax: (416) 907-1465 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Morant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fraser ( CPSO# 93191 )
Dr. K. Morant ( CPSO# 93668 )

Business Address:
350 Victoria Street
181 Kerr Hall West
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Phone Number: (416) 979-5070

Business Address:
Corcare
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREEM MORANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014