skip to content

Moran Mendoza, Angel Onofre

CPSO#: 87540

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma de San Luis Potosi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-1380
Fax: (613) 549-1459 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Onofre Moran Mendoza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moran Mendoza ( CPSO# 87540 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-1380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2014 Active
             Dr. Angel Onofre Moran Mendoza may practise independently in respirology, only.