skip to content

Morales, Alvaro

CPSO#: 26175

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Xavier Pontifical University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alvaro Morales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart St Kingston, ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 17 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2019