skip to content

Moosavi, Homayoon

CPSO#: 87845

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Oct 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GRHC Kitchener Waterloo Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
835 King Street West P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2981
Fax: (519) 749-4296 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd.
ON
N2M !B2
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moosavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016
Corporation Name: Homayoon Moosavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Moosavi ( CPSO# 87845 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital-Kitchener Waterloo Site
Department of Medical Imaging
P.O. Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Oct 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Apr 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009 Active
             Dr.  Homayoon  Moosavi  may  practise  independently  in the area of Diagnostic
            Radiology only.