skip to content

Moosai-Maharaj, Sastri Gerard

CPSO#: 26862

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 51
1267 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6M3Z5
Phone: 6474449835 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Moosai-Maharaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018