skip to content

Fadhel, Moosa Mohamedraza

CPSO#: 110968

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Nov 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centro Healthcare Clinic
7777 Weston Road
Unit 114
Vaughan ON  L4L 0G9
Phone: (905) 605 4744
Fax: 416 987 0585 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moosa Fadhel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fadhel ( CPSO# 110968)

Business Address:
30 Dunhum Drive
Alliston ON  L9R 0G1

Business Address:
11290 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 832-3300

Business Address:
Nobleton Medical and Walk-In Clinic
12931 Highway 27
Nobleton ON  L0G 1N0
Phone Number: (905) 859-9998

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
7777 Weston Road
Suite 114
Vaughan ON  L4L 0G9
Phone Number: (905) 605-4744


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Aug 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOOSA MOHAMEDRAZA FADHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADHEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017