skip to content

Moores, Daisy Elizabeth

CPSO#: 88930

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa, On
K1Y 4G2
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daisy Moores Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Moores ( CPSO# 88930 )

Business Address:
99 Fifth Avenue
Suite 17
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone Number: (613) 563-3670

Business Address:
104-1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 691-2578

Business Address:
Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAISY ELIZABETH MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011