skip to content

Moores, Andrew Roderick

CPSO#: 98126

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline St. North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: 705-328-6115
Fax: 705-328-6206 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Moores Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moores ( CPSO# 98126 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW RODERICK MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 17 Aug 2015
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015