skip to content

Moore, Stephen Blair

CPSO#: 23044

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephen Blair Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 7 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 763 Crozier Rd RR1 Westport ON K06 1X1 Fax: 613-273-7111
Date Received: 28 Sep 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 2018