skip to content

Moore, Nicholas Jasper

CPSO#: 20756

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 302 20 Wynford Drive Toronto ON M3C 1J4
Date Received: 23 May 2017


Address: (416) 445-9673
Instructions: Please contact the above phone number for medical record inquiries. Records have transferred into the possession of the physician who has taken over the practice.
Date Received: 29 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2017