skip to content

Moore, Jennifer Dorothy

CPSO#: 92551

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Loyola University of Chicago, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Palliative Care Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7255
Fax: (416) 480-5146 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective:10 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011 Active
 Dr.  Jennifer  Dorothy  Moore may practise medicine independently in Palliative
            Care, only.