skip to content

Moore, Amanda Margaret

CPSO#: 100113

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 15 Apr 2013 to 07 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 30 Nov 2015 to 25 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Dec 2015