skip to content

Moola, Cassim

CPSO#: 41774

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
430 The Boardwalk
Unit 108
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: 519 5768760
Fax: 519 5768768 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

421 Greenbrook Drive
Unit 23A
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Canada
Phone: 519 5698592
Fax: 519 5697286
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Moola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moola ( CPSO# 41774 )

Business Address:
20A - 385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 749-9555

Business Address:
23A - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 569-8592

Business Address:
101 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 646-4555

Business Address:
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 576-8760

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CASSIM MOOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Feb 1991