skip to content

Moodley, Preveshen

CPSO#: 93363

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Specialist Clinic
Suite 129
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-3488
Fax: (705) 805-0825 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Preveshen Moodley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moodley ( CPSO# 93363 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Specialist Clinic
129-150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-3488

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PREVESHEN MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Oct 2016
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016