skip to content

Moodley, Prabashnee

CPSO#: 92351

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alton Village Medical Clinic
Unit 5
4631 Palladium Way
Burlington
Burlington ON  L7M 0W9
Phone: (905) 319-9299
Fax: (289) 427-5167 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Moodley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moodley ( CPSO# 92351 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRABASHNEE MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2012