Montpetit, Catherine-Anne (CPSO#: 98847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4275 ch. Innes, Suite 104
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone: 613-424-6343
Fax: 613-424-6422
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE-ANNE MONTPETIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTPETIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Jan 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015