skip to content

Montpellier, Renee-Anne Pierrette

CPSO#: 99983

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Montpellier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Montpellier ( CPSO# 99983 )

Business Address:
Blind River District Health Centre
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-2265

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 25 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RENEE-ANNE PIERRETTE MONTPELLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTPELLIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2013 to 14 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015