skip to content

Montgomery, Hugh John

CPSO#: 25867

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Feb 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2660 Marchurst Road
Dunrobin ON  K0A 1T0
Phone: (613) 832-2515 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Montgomery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Montgomery ( CPSO# 25867 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUGH JOHN MONTGOMERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTGOMERY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1978