skip to content

Monkhouse, Alan Keith

CPSO#: 27097

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Corporation Name: Alan K. Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Grandview Medical Centre 167 Hespeler Road Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018