skip to content

Monk, Charles Michael

CPSO#: 30354

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 344-8283 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Charles M. Monk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Monk ( CPSO# 30354 )

Business Address:
103 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-8283


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLES MICHAEL MONK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1978