skip to content

Monjed, Alaa Khalil R

CPSO#: 86094

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 17 Apr 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Western University, 30 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 30 Jun 2008 to 13 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 14 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 11 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Western University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Western University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Oct 2013
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2013