skip to content

Moniz, Faustino Pimentel

CPSO#: 30303

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 305
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 522-5231 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F. P. Moniz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Moniz ( CPSO# 30303 )
Dr. J. McLean ( CPSO# 52200 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 522-5231

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FAUSTINO PIMENTEL MONIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONIZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1978