skip to content

Monir Abbasi, Mitra

CPSO#: 94101

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-650 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON  M2K 3E4
Phone: 6472492996
Fax: 6472492996 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Summerville Family Health Team
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Canada
Phone: 9052729700
Fax: 905.272.1416
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

101-650 Sheppard Ave. East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B7
Canada
Phone: 647-249-2996
Fax: 647-249-2996
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Monir Abbasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Monir Abbasi Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Monir Abbasi ( CPSO# 94101 )

Business Address:
15 Rapallo Mews
Mississauga ON  L5N 1K8
Phone Number: 6472492981

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MITRA MONIR ABBASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONIR ABBASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015