skip to content

Monchesky, Theodore Carl

CPSO#: 23204

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monchesky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2020
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020