skip to content

Molot, John Mark

CPSO#: 26190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Oct 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1973
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Environmental Health Clinic
Women's College Hospital
77 Grenville Street
Main Floor Room 107
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN MARK MOLOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLOT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1973

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)