Molnar, Iulia Alina (CPSO#: 97545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: Bogza, Iulia Alina (used until: 22 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Highway 105
Red Lake ON  P0V2M0
Phone: 8077272617
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

66 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: 6478384040
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Iulia Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Molnar ( CPSO# 97545 )

Business Address:
55 Hwy 105
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-2617

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 212-1433

Business Address:
4000 Hwy 7
Unit 2
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 851-3777

Business Address:
200 - 66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 922-0566

Business Address:
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1392

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IULIA ALINA MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014