skip to content

Mollon, Brent Gary

CPSO#: 92910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone: (705) 329-1811
Fax: (705) 329-1911 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brent Mollon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mollon ( CPSO# 92910 )

Business Address:
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone Number: (705) 329-1811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRENT GARY MOLLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2015 to 30 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015