skip to content

Moller, Thomas Friedrich Adolf

CPSO#: 94374

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Christian Alberts University at Kiel, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Germany
Norway

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 11 Nov 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016