skip to content

Mok, Philip Sai-Ho

CPSO#: 95083

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Heath Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip Mok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mok ( CPSO# 95083 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP SAI-HO MOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016