skip to content

Mok, Lynn Chang

CPSO#: 22371

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 08 Nov 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1996
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.