skip to content

Mojtabaie, Parmiss

CPSO#: 89048

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016