skip to content

Moitri, Misha Othir

CPSO#: 97825

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
849 Alexander Court
Unit 304
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: 705-616-0786
Fax: 705-616-0787 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Misha O. Moitri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moitri ( CPSO# 97825 )

Business Address:
849 Alexander Crt
Suite 304
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: 705-616-0786

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:05 Apr 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MISHA OTHIR MOITRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOITRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2019