skip to content

Mohseni Mofidi, Niki

CPSO#: 100930

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
440 Jarvis St
Toronto ON  M4Y 2H3
Phone: (416) 924-1164 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIKI MOHSENI MOFIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHSENI MOFIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2019