skip to content

Mohiuddin, Masarrat

CPSO#: 30226

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Sep 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Osmania University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Sep 1990