skip to content

Mohindra, Baldev Krishan

CPSO#: 21675

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jun 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University Of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:26 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2011