skip to content

Mohareb, Mona Milad

CPSO#: 92248

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mona Mohareb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Cornwall Community Hospital 840 McConnell Avenue Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Date Received: 01 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017