skip to content

Mohankumar, Rakesh

CPSO#: 98976

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2014
EXPIRY DATE
31 Mar 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3Mc-420
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5800 Ext. 3892 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Mohankumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohankumar ( CPSO# 98976 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3MC420
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2015 Active
             1.    Dr. Rakesh Mohankumar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto, in which Dr. Mohankumar holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Mohankumar  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that Dr. Mohankumar's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee   makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Mohankumar's
                        certificate  of  registration,   following   consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  April  1,  2014.   In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 31, 2021.