skip to content

Khan, Mohammed Asif Hameed

CPSO#: 77119

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Oct 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Manchester, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 578-8050
Fax: (519) 578-9955 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 77119 )

Business Address:
Unit 302
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 578-8050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ASIF HAMEED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2020

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Khan’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Khan is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct in his prescribing practices between approximately 2016 and 2018 including in appropriately co-signing prescriptions, in his assessments, communications and medical record-keeping in respect of these prescriptions, in being paid to co-sign prescriptions and in providing blank prescriptions to an acquaintance.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): May 19, 2021